Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1062 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31712 Week
» 130357 Month
» 333021 Year
» 3359874 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16562 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7479 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47479 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
50 |
Works Number |
4181 |
To Service |
During 01/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/08/1962 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 7 mths , 4 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16562 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4181 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7479 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea (Upper Bank) (4C) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47479 |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47479 |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|