Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2572 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2572 Week
» 137388 Month
» 340052 Year
» 3366905 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16649 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7566 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47566 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. |
Order Number |
52 |
Works Number |
1579 |
To Service |
During 05/1928 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1966 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 5 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
8E |
Brunswick |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
8E |
Brunswick |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
ALLOC |
8L |
Aintree |
5w/e |
11/07/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
05/11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16649 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd., Works Number 1579 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7566 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47566 |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
04/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47566 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|