Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3218 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33868 Week
» 132513 Month
» 335177 Year
» 3362030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16689 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7606 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47606 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
354 |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/06/1965 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5E |
Alsager |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
1C |
Watford |
5w/e |
04/08/1962 |
ALLOC |
WW |
|
4w/e |
02/03/1963 |
ALLOC |
1C |
Watford |
4w/e |
30/03/1963 |
ALLOC |
1E |
Bletchley |
4w/e |
01/06/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16689 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 354 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7606 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47606 |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Alsager (5E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47606 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|