Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1328 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1328 Week
» 136144 Month
» 338808 Year
» 3365661 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16701 |
m/e |
11/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7618 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47618 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
366 |
To Service |
During 11/1928 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1963 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
LOAN |
CW |
|
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16701 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 366 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7618 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47618 |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
10/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47618 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|