Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2511 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28545 Week
» 127190 Month
» 329854 Year
» 3356707 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16718 |
m/e |
12/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7635 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47635 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
60 |
Works Number |
383 |
To Service |
During 12/1928 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1960 |
Service Life |
32 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16718 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 383 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7635 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47635 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bromsgrove (21C) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47635 |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|