Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3146 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33796 Week
» 132441 Month
» 335105 Year
» 3361958 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
586 |
m/e |
05/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6909 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
1560 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4136 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/03/1948 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1901 |
1C |
|
Watford |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
2B |
|
Bletchley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
07/12/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1914 |
Rebuilt with Slide Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1947 |
Watford Area |
Watford, having lost all the ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-2T's viz: Nos. 6869, 6871, and 6909, their miscellaneous duties are now performed by the three 2-6-2T's Nos. 10, 20, and 43. The latter have consequently been taken off their regular work on the St. Albans branch, which is now in the hands of 2-4-2T's Nos. 6686, 6725 and 6729. These are the only Webb engines still left in the London area. The Stanmore branch is operated-by the two 0-4-4T's Nos. 1908 and 1909. The two Jinty's (Nos. 7327 and 7359) which were recently at Watford for several months, have now returned to Willesden. Apart from the still numerous 0-8-0's ex L.N.W.R. engines are now extremely rare on the old L.N.W.R. main line. The last 'Claughton' No. 6004 has made two appearances in London, on 3rd February and again on 18th March. The 'Princes' at Bletchley work mainly on the Oxford and Cambridge branches and seldom come to London since their last regular turn, the 6.35 a.m. ex Bletchley returning with 5.25 p.m. ex Euston, was turned over to a class 5 working at the end of last year. The poor old 'Princes' in their present deplorable state of maintenance could not keep time with the somewhat smartly timed 5.25 p.m., invariably losing anything from 5 to 20 minutes, according to the particular engine and the enthusiasm-or lack of it-of the driver. As a regular traveller by this train one cannot really regret their replacement, apart from the sentimental aspect. |
SLS/194706 |
20/07/1948 |
Crewe Works |
July 20th saw the completion of No. 44747, the last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 469; this was followed by Nos. 41210 and 41211 , the first 2-6-2T's of Order E 470, completed on 29/7 and 4/8 respectively. These engines differ from those of the previous batch in that they are fitted for 'motor train' working. The first two engines are also equipped with a modified cylinder lubricator (mechanical), in which the oil level may be observed through a glass set in one side of the lubricator casting. No. 5525 is the latest 'Patriot' 4-6-0 to be rebuilt, and was completed on 29/7. No. 5527 will follow shortly. The ranks of ex L.N.W.R. locomotives continue to be thinned, the following locomotives having gone to the scrap heap since the end of June: W/E 3/7, Nos. 6686, 7740, 28350; W/E 24/7, Nos. 6909, 9103, 9201; W/E 31/7, Nos. 9095 an 28261. In connection with the Centenary of the Chester & Holyhead Rly., Cornwall and Hardwicke were recently dispatched for exhibition at Conway. Three more 4-6-0's have been repainted black with ex L.N.W.R. lining. They are Class '5' No. 44825, Class '5XP' No. 45663 and Class '6P' No. 45529, which was named Stephenson W/E 24/7. Class '5' 4-6-0 No. 44755, the first double chimney Caprotti engine, has been fitted with an indicator cab across the front end for the purpose of obtaining steam distribution data |
SLS/194809 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 586 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4136 |
|
|
04/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Slide Valves |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6909 |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6909 |
|
|
07/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|