Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4572 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30606 Week
» 129251 Month
» 331915 Year
» 3358768 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2541 |
m/e |
08/1896 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8953 |
m/e |
10/1923 |
British Railways |
48953 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3666 |
To Service |
During 08/1896 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
LOAN |
3A |
Bescot |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
4A |
Bletchley |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1896 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2541 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3666 |
|
|
10/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8953 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48953 |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48953 |
|
|