Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 49 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30699 Week
» 129344 Month
» 332008 Year
» 3358861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1878 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9024 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
49024 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4032 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/02/1957 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1878 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4032 |
|
|
02/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9024 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49024 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49024 |
|
|