Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2735 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33385 Week
» 132030 Month
» 334694 Year
» 3361547 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2653 |
m/e |
01/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9154 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49154 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4890 |
To Service |
During 01/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
26/10/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) |
Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2653 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4890 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49154 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49154 |
|
|