Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2593 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28627 Week
» 127272 Month
» 329936 Year
» 3356789 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2235 |
m/e |
07/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9310 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
British Railways |
49310 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1918 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1961 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
4A |
Bletchley |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2235 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9310 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49310 |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (4A) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49310 |
|
|