Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2497 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33147 Week
» 131792 Month
» 334456 Year
» 3361309 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43113 |
on |
13/04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 13/04/1951 to Skipton (23A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 03/09/1966 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1962 |
Lancaster Green Ayre MPD |
Lancaster shed has acquired four unrebuilt Patriots (45505/7/10/8) to cover three turns previously performed by BR standard 4MTs which have been re-transferred to Springs Branch. Its Ivatt 2-6-0s (43007/52/112/3/5) have been transferred mainly to Nuneaton in exchange for Horwich moguls. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/04/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43113 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Skipton (23A) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
03/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43113 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|