Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1351 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12566 Week
» 3622 Month
» 350046 Year
» 3376899 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13052 |
on |
27/06/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2752 |
|
08/03/1935 |
British Railways |
42752 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Sat 27/06/1927 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
5w/e |
03/03/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. |
SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 |
Coventry (Stored) |
On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13052 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
08/03/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2752 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42752 |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42752 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|