Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 1334 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31984 Week
» 130629 Month
» 333293 Year
» 3360146 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13088 |
on |
03/10/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2788 |
|
07/12/1934 |
British Railways |
42788 |
|
28/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Sat 03/10/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/09/1964 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13088 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
07/12/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2788 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42788 |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
14/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42788 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|