Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3124 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33774 Week
» 132419 Month
» 335083 Year
» 3361936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13111 |
on |
08/05/1929 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2811 |
|
23/05/1935 |
British Railways |
42811 |
|
11/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
87 |
To Service |
Sat 08/05/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/07/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 01/12/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/05/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13111 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
23/05/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2811 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42811 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
13/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42811 |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|