Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4152 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34802 Week
» 133447 Month
» 336111 Year
» 3362964 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13203 |
on |
05/09/1930 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2903 |
|
16/05/1935 |
British Railways |
42903 |
|
26/02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
346 |
To Service |
Sat 05/09/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/08/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 20/10/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13203 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
16/05/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2903 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42903 |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42903 |
|
|
20/10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|