Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2394 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2394 Week
» 137210 Month
» 339874 Year
» 3366727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Orig) |
13240 |
on |
29/12/1932 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2940 |
|
27/11/1934 |
British Railways |
42940 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
CRAB |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
367 |
To Service |
Sat 29/12/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/09/1965 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) |
Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13240 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
27/11/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2940 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42940 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
15/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
25/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42940 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|