Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2581 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2581 Week
» 137397 Month
» 340061 Year
» 3366914 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2318 |
on |
30/03/1928 |
British Railways |
42318 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 30/03/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/09/1962 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Mon 11/03/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2318 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42318 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42318 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|