23/02/1950 |
Derby Works |
New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. |
SLS/195003 |
13/04/1960 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. |
SLS/196005 |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Kingmoor MPD (Stored) |
In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. |
SLS/196304 |
11/04/1963 |
Derby Works (Stored) |
Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. |
SLS/196304 |
27/04/1963 |
Birmingham Excursions (Stored) |
On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. |
SLS/196304 |