Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2482 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33132 Week
» 131777 Month
» 334441 Year
» 3361294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2575 |
on |
17/09/1936 |
British Railways |
42575 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Tue 29/01/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9G |
Northwich |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
5w/e |
06/10/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2575 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24331 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42575 |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
13/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42575 |
|
|
29/01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|