Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 1296 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31946 Week
» 130591 Month
» 333255 Year
» 3360108 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2634 |
on |
27/09/1938 |
British Railways |
42634 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 27/09/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 09/01/1965 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/09/1938 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2634 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42634 |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42634 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|