Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4248 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34898 Week
» 133543 Month
» 336207 Year
» 3363060 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2670 |
on |
28/12/1942 |
British Railways |
42670 |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 28/12/1942 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/12/1964 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2670 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
11/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42670 |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42670 |
|
|
11/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|