|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 40170, 40651/63, 687, 40907/09, 912/22, 1129/34, 41177, 1182, 2691, 42699, 2736, 42749, 2880, 42927, 44699, 44900, 4956, 44959/75, 45029/49, 45117/23/52/72, 45251, 45356/62/63, 45463/64/74/85/90, 45575/79, 45728, 7332, 47540, 14450, 14500/01, 55200, 15203/29, 16152, 56170, 16318, 56320, 16328/34, 17270, 57312, 17437, 17593, 17642. On 12/11, No. 54472, the first ex C.R. locomotive to bear the crest was ex Works. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2691 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) | ||
31/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42691 | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) | ||
22/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) | ||
25/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42691 | ||
24/09/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
30/09/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |