Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1363 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 32013 Week
» 130658 Month
» 333322 Year
» 3360175 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2250 |
on |
24/10/1946 |
British Railways |
42250 |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 24/10/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 12/12/1964 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
24/10/1946 |
13A |
|
Plaistow |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34E |
|
Neasden |
4w/e |
22/01/1955 |
2F |
|
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/12/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2250 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42250 |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42250 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|