Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 571 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 571 Week
» 54025 Month
» 400449 Year
» 3427302 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2251 |
on |
30/10/1946 |
British Railways |
42251 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 30/10/1946 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1967 |
Service Life |
20 yrs , 11 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2251 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42251 |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tebay (12E) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42251 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|