|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/01/1960 | Blackburn-Wigan | On 2nd January, 42722 (24D) worked the last train of three coaches, the 8-21 p.m. Chorley to Wigan North Western. 42295 (24A) worked the last train 9-45 p.m. Wigan N.W. to Chorley. 42473 (27D) worked the last train (four coaches) 11 p.m. Blackburn to Chorley. | SLS/196002 |
08/01/1961 | Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2295 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) | ||
15/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42295 | ||
04/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) | ||
04/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) | ||
19/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
14/08/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
16/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42295 | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |