Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 1030 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31680 Week
» 130325 Month
» 332989 Year
» 3359842 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2196 |
on |
28/02/1948 |
British Railways |
42196 |
on |
28/02/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Mon 28/02/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 29/05/1967 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
30A |
Corkerhill |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
67C |
Ayr |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
3w/e |
08/09/1962 |
ALLOC |
67E |
Dumfries |
5w/e |
13/10/1962 |
ALLOC |
55H |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
18/06/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/05/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/08/1948 |
Troon Station |
Ex L.N.E.R. locomotives reached Troon on 28/8; the first time known to the Station staff. Two twelve coach (non-corridor) Party Specials from Kirkintilloch were brought in by green 'B.1's' Nos. 1180 an 61336. The engines went to Ayr shed, propelling the coaches to and from Troon Harbour Sidings by the loop line. 'Propelling' on the Main line, as well as on sidings is a daily occurrence here and distances thus covered are not inconsiderable-such as Kilwinning or Irvine to Ayr. Usually a brake van is propelled, but occasionally a small number of wagons are sandwiched in between. Speeds are normal. Owing to the incidence of Specials, 'Caley' 4-4-0's are used intermittently on the Glasgow-Ayr and Kilmarnock-Ayr trains during the Summer timetable period. This has been unknown during the previous two years, except on one or two isolated occasions when there had been a failure or mishap. Between Glasgow and Ayr the 2-6-4T's Nos. 2192-8 have taken the place of most of the aged and ailing 'Compounds.' '5XP' and '5P' 4-6-0's appear to be more numerous. The 'Caley' 4-4-0's keep time and appear to steam easily in so doing. The loads vary from 4-8 non-corridor coaches |
SLS/194810 |
30/06/1950 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Engines into shops: 2196, 40640, 42804, 57291, 57303. |
SLS/195008 |
11/07/1963 |
Glasgow (St. Rollox) (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: 42124, 42259, 42780, 44705/787, 45365, 45473, D359, D3009, D3533, D3741, D5128, D6124, D8076. Waiting Works: 42196, 42274, 42699, 42735, 44701, 45178. D3563, D5356. Ex-Works: 42736, 45053, D6123. Diesel Test House: D361, D3557. Works Shunters: D3412/6. Stored: GSWR 0-6-0T, D6100/1/2/4/6/7/14/8/20/5/7/30. |
SLS/196308 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42196 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2196 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
29/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2196 |
|
|
29/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42196 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|