Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2716 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33366 Week
» 132011 Month
» 334675 Year
» 3361528 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42142 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
w/e Sun 31/12/1949 to St Albans (14C) |
Withdrawal |
Sun 26/06/1966 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
20C |
Royston |
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
LOAN |
64D |
Carstairs |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
LOAN |
56B |
Ardsley |
4w/e |
12/10/1963 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/06/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42142 |
|
|
09/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carstairs (64D) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
26/06/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42142 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|