Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3192 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 3192 Week
» 138008 Month
» 340672 Year
» 3367525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
592 |
m/e |
09/1928 |
British Railways |
40592 |
w/e |
11/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 09/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 21/12/1961 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
32A |
Inverness |
w/e |
03/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
28C |
Carstairs |
w/e |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/12/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 592 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carstairs (28C) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
11/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40592 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
21/12/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40592 |
|
|
07/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|