Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4608 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35258 Week
» 133903 Month
» 336567 Year
» 3363420 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
646 |
m/e |
09/1931 |
British Railways |
40646 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 09/1931 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/05/1962 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
4w/e |
28/05/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 646 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40646 |
|
|
07/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40646 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|