Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1246 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1246 Week
» 136062 Month
» 338726 Year
» 3365579 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
666 |
m/e |
01/1932 |
British Railways |
40666 |
m/e |
08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 01/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 31/07/1959 |
Service Life |
27 yrs , 7 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 666 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carstairs (28C) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carstairs (64D) |
|
|
08/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
08/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40666 |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
31/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40666 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|