Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4344 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34994 Week
» 133639 Month
» 336303 Year
» 3363156 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
680 |
m/e |
03/1932 |
British Railways |
40680 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
2P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 03/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/11/1959 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 680 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40680 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40680 |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|