Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 980 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 980 Week
» 135796 Month
» 338460 Year
» 3365313 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1055 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
British Railways |
41055 |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 04/1924 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1953 |
Service Life |
28 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1055 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (19G) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41055 |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41055 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|