Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4276 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30310 Week
» 128955 Month
» 331619 Year
» 3358472 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1076 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
British Railways |
41076 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1924 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/05/1955 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/05/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1076 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41076 |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/05/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41076 |
|
|