Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4760 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35410 Week
» 134055 Month
» 336719 Year
» 3363572 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
1150 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
British Railways |
41150 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4003 |
To Service |
During 08/1925 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/09/1957 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 1150 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4003 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41150 |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
09/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41150 |
|
|