Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3185 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33835 Week
» 132480 Month
» 335144 Year
» 3361997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
937 |
m/e |
08/1932 |
British Railways |
40937 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
Compound |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 08/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/04/1958 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 937 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40937 |
|
|
01/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (23A) |
|
|
26/08/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40937 |
|
|
05/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|