Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3708 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34358 Week
» 133003 Month
» 335667 Year
» 3362520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Midland Railway |
184 |
y/e |
1894 |
Midland Railway (1907) |
443 |
y/e |
1907 |
British Railways |
40443 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
2203 |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Order Number |
1235 |
To Service |
During 02/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/01/1961 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1894 |
5C |
|
Stafford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
21A |
|
Saltley |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
18A |
|
Toton |
w/e |
23/04/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
5w/e |
30/04/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 1904 |
H boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1894 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 184 |
|
|
1904 |
Modification |
Modification: H boiler fitted |
|
|
1907 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 443 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40443 |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40443 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|