Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 550 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2665 Week
» 25171 Month
» 328361 Year
» 1549926 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4622 on 05/06/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 330
To Service Mon 05/06/1942
Withdrawal Mon 01/06/1964
Scrapping During 08/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 05/06/1942
83F Truro 4w/e 31/10/1959
83B Taunton 4w/e 27/01/1962
81C Southall 4w/e 25/01/1964
   Withdrawn on 01/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 27/01/1964
WDN   2w/e 08/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1942 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4622
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
01/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4622    

prev prev