Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1072 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31722 Week
» 130367 Month
» 333031 Year
» 3359884 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4859 |
on |
09/08/1935 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1459 |
on |
09/11/1946 (at Oswestry) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
288 |
To Service |
Sun 09/08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1958 |
Service Life |
23 yrs , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4859 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
09/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1459 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1459 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|