Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 5546 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 16761 Week
» 7817 Month
» 354241 Year
» 3381094 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (1st) |
4865 |
on |
21/02/1936 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1465 |
on |
02/11/1946 (at Oswestry) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
14xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
287 |
To Service |
Sun 21/02/1936 to Bushbury (13) |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1958 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/02/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4865 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
02/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1465 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1465 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|