Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2148 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11092 Week
» 2148 Month
» 348572 Year
» 3375425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5654 |
29/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31228 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31454 |
29/10/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31554 |
30/04/1990 |
|
TOPS (31/4 (2)) |
31454 |
01/02/2002 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
29/09/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
04/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
04/1982 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5654 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 254 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31228 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
04/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
29/10/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31454 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31554 |
|
|
01/02/2002 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31454 |
|
|