|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/02/1949 | 12/02/1949 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1949 | 20/05/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1950 | 03/05/1950 | 87 days | General | Named ABBOTSFORD |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1950 | 24/11/1950 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1951 | 22/01/1951 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1951 | 19/09/1951 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1953 | 17/03/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29843 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1954 | 26/10/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1956 | 28/03/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1957 | 18/10/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1959 | 16/03/1959 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1961 | 28/04/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29883 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1963 | 20/11/1963 | 1 day | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60141 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2060 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949. | ||
02/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949. | ||
09/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
06/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 03/05/1950. Work undertaken: Named ABBOTSFORD |
||
03/05/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
13/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950. | ||
05/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1951. Dep: 22/01/1951. | ||
07/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 19/09/1951. | ||
19/09/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
16/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1953. Dep: 17/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29843 (Diagram 118) |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 26/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1956. Dep: 28/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10595 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1957. Dep: 18/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/03/1959. Dep: 16/03/1959. | ||
03/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1961. Dep: 28/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29883 (Diagram 118) |
||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
20/11/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1963. Dep: 20/11/1963. | ||
05/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60141 from York (North) (50A) |