|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1920 | 07/1920 | General | Boiler number G666 (Diagram 61) |
|||
Darlington Works | 1922 | 11/1922 | General | Boiler number D1345 (Diagram 61) |
|||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1925 | 16/07/1925 | 129 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1926 | 24/02/1927 | 122 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1929 | 27/03/1929 | 59 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1931 | 29/05/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1934 | 11/01/1934 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1934 | 23/08/1934 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1936 | 19/06/1936 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1936 | 26/01/1937 | 69 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1989 (Diagram 61) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1938 | 25/05/1938 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1942 | 24/11/1942 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1943 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1943 | 06/01/1944 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 52 days | General | Downs sanding & T strap fitted Boiler number D1787 (Diagram 61) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1946 | 05/03/1946 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1948 | 21/12/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69794 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1951 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 690 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 88 Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 61 boiler fitted |
||
08/1916 | Modification | Modification: Rebuilt from 4-6-0T to 4-6-2T with increased coal and water capacity | ||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: ?/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number G666 (Diagram 61) |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/11/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1345 (Diagram 61) |
||
10/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1925. Dep: 16/07/1925. | ||
26/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1926. Dep: 24/02/1927. | ||
28/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1929. Dep: 27/03/1929. | ||
14/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1931. Dep: 29/05/1931. | ||
12/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
07/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. | ||
04/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1934. Dep: 11/01/1934. | ||
02/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1934. Dep: 23/08/1934. | ||
04/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1936. Dep: 19/06/1936. | ||
19/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/11/1936. Dep: 26/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1989 (Diagram 61) |
||
28/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
30/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1938. Dep: 25/05/1938. | ||
06/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
01/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
02/12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
18/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
08/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1942. Dep: 24/11/1942. | ||
25/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (NLN) | ||
17/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1943. | ||
21/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
30/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1943. Dep: 06/01/1944. | ||
08/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
03/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: Downs sanding & T strap fitted Boiler number D1787 (Diagram 61) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 05/03/1946. | ||
12/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9794 | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
11/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 21/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69794 |
||
08/1951 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/08/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69794 from Starbeck (50D) | ||
15/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/08/1951. |