|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1949 | 17/11/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9845 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61246 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1951 | 25/09/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1953 | 14/07/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28412 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1955 | 29/11/1955 | 71 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/08/1957 | 17/09/1957 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28642 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1959 | 02/04/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1960 | 02/07/1960 | 40 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1246 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26147 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'LORD BALFOUR OF BURLEIGH' | ||
18/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1949. Dep: 17/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9845 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61246 |
||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 25/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 14/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28412 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
20/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/09/1955. Dep: 29/11/1955. | ||
12/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
30/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
07/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1957. Dep: 17/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28642 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
24/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1959. Dep: 02/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 02/07/1960. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61246 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |