|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Unknown Works | 1922 | 05/1922 | General | Boiler number D239 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1925 | 30/06/1925 | 97 days | General | Boiler number D697 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1925 | 31/07/1925 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1926 | 29/09/1926 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1926 | 13/01/1927 | 52 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1928 | 23/05/1928 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1929 | 09/07/1929 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1931 | 19/10/1931 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D671 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1936 | 12/03/1936 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 1 day | No repairs | Condemned |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 1 day | Special | To Store |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1939 | 20/11/1939 | 39 days | General | Re-instated to serve war effort |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1943 | 31/03/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1946 | 08/04/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1912 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 824 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Unknown Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/05/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number D239 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1925. Dep: 30/06/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D697 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1925. Dep: 31/07/1925. | ||
24/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1926. Dep: 29/09/1926. | ||
23/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1926. Dep: 13/01/1927. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
10/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1928. Dep: 23/05/1928. | ||
20/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1929. Dep: 09/07/1929. | ||
31/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1931. Dep: 19/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D671 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1936. Dep: 12/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/08/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. Work undertaken: Condemned |
||
12/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 12/08/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. Work undertaken: To Store |
||
13/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1939. Dep: 20/11/1939. Work undertaken: Re-instated to serve war effort |
||
20/11/1939 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
02/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 31/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1326 but not taken up | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1698 but not taken up | ||
08/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 08/04/1946. Dep: 08/04/1946. | ||
27/04/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 824 from Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |