|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/07/1925 | 12/08/1925 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/09/1925 | 10/11/1925 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1927 | 20/09/1927 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1928 | 16/06/1928 | 60 days | General | Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1931 | 21/10/1931 | 44 days | General | Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1125 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1935 | 29/05/1935 | 71 days | General | Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1937 | 16/07/1937 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1938 | 01/11/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1939 | 02/11/1939 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1942 | 27/03/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 240]2 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1945 | 08/03/1945 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3576 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1945 | 13/09/1945 | 1 day | Unclassified | Water scoop refitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/05/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 61445 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1951 | 31/05/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1953 | 17/11/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1955 | 03/09/1955 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1956 | 07/05/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24083 (Diagram 49) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1959 | 17/08/1959 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1960 | 02/08/1960 | 4 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1960 | 02/09/1960 | 4 days | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/01/1955 | York MPD | 69369 (34E) mentioned in last month's notes, duly proceeded to Darlington (Bank Top), but was not accepted into North Road works. After returning to York, it spent a considerable time under repair in York shed before proceeding to Darnall (39B) on transfer. 'J25' 65650 an 65654 are now in store at York together with 62345. On 15th January, a Sheffield to Middlesbrough football excursion (M886) was worked throughout by 44855 (19A), which took water in York station platforms. On the same date 61028 (38C) was at York en route for Darlington works for repair. Other GC Section 'Bls' for Darlington works recently have included 61141 (38C), 61152 (39B) and 61328 (40B). 'Patriot' 45510 (5A) was an unusual visitor at York on 17th January. On 21st January, the 9.22 a.m. Leeds (City) to Scarborough was worked by 'B16/1' 61445 (50B) instead of the usual Holbeck Class 5, but 44853 (20A) worked the 3.10 p.m. York to Leeds (City). | SLS/195503 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, i Complete Locos) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/05/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2374 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1183 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 49 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1925. Dep: 12/08/1925. | ||
08/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1925. Dep: 10/11/1925. | ||
06/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1927. Dep: 20/09/1927. | ||
18/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1468 (Diagram 49) |
||
08/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1931. Dep: 21/10/1931. Work undertaken: Standard buffers & hook Boiler number D1125 (Diagram 49) |
||
13/07/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
19/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
20/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1935. Dep: 29/05/1935. Work undertaken: Steam Brakes fitted |
||
02/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2884 (Diagram 49) |
||
14/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1937. Dep: 16/07/1937. | ||
19/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1938. Dep: 01/11/1938. | ||
29/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1939. Dep: 02/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2879 (Diagram 49) |
||
17/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1942. Dep: 27/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 240]2 (Diagram 49A) |
||
05/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1945. Dep: 08/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3576 (Diagram 49A) |
||
13/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1945. Dep: 13/09/1945. Work undertaken: Water scoop refitted |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1445 | ||
17/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. | ||
08/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2559 (Diagram 49) |
||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
30/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61445 |
||
30/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1951. Dep: 31/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24014 (Diagram 49A) |
||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
30/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24010 (Diagram 49A) |
||
16/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1953. Dep: 17/11/1953. | ||
29/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955. | ||
04/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1956. Dep: 07/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24083 (Diagram 49) |
||
19/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24033 (Diagram 49A) |
||
10/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1959. Dep: 17/08/1959. | ||
30/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/07/1960. Dep: 02/08/1960. | ||
30/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/08/1960. Dep: 02/09/1960. | ||
04/07/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61445 from Scarborough (50E) | ||
08/1961 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |