Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4079 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34729 Week
» 133374 Month
» 336038 Year
» 3362891 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2018 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2347 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62347 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
D20 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 15/11/1954 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SKN |
Stockton |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
51J |
Northallerton |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/11/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1913 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1947 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2018 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
09/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2347 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62347 |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
15/11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62347 |
|
|
01/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|