Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1064 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31714 Week
» 130359 Month
» 333023 Year
» 3359876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
708 |
m/e |
10/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2373 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62373 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
D20 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 10/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/02/1953 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51J |
Northallerton |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1921 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1946 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1953 |
Darlington Works |
Nos. 78006/7/8/9 are in traffic. Can anyone confirm that they carry 1952 plates? No. 46478 has been in for intermediate and repaint. Nos. 67291, 67303/31 an 62373 have been condemned. The old shed at Ferryhill has been demolished: since the closure-16 years ago-a few engines on stock have been stored there, the last being Nos. 67278, 62359 an 62365, taken away about two years ago. 'J21' No. 65070 has received a full repair. |
SLS/195306 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1906 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 708 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
01/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
04/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2373 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62373 |
|
|
09/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
23/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62373 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|