Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1243 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31893 Week
» 130538 Month
» 333202 Year
» 3360055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1209 |
m/e |
04/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2387 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
62387 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
D20 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 04/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/09/1957 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SEL |
Selby |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
BRI |
Bridlington |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
ALN |
|
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
ALLOC |
52DALN |
|
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/09/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1917 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1948 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1957 |
Darlington Works |
On the 10th July, D49/2 62727, B16/2 61435 and J26 65755 were noted repainted with the new emblem. There were no engines in the scrap yard waiting cutting up and all that could be seen were the wheels of A5 tank 69833. On Wednesday, 21st August, B1 61131 re-painted ex works was observed at Hett Mill working north on a goods about noon. In the afternoon, B1 61080 also repainted ex works was observed at Cowton working a south bound goods. On the same day, V1 67674, V2 60938 and O7 90469 were noted outside Darlington Works having been overhauled and repainted. In the sidings across Whessoe Road from the works, V2 60914, D49/1 62713, J77 68426 and D20 62387 were observed standing dead. In the scrap yard, T1 69916 was in course of being cut up, only the frames and wheels remaining. Diesel trains are working some services between Darlington and Richmond. With the commencement of the Winter timetable, further diesel trains are expected to be allocated to the Newcastle-Middlesbrough services. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1209 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
10/1917 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2387 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - West Hartlepool (WHL) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62387 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (SEL) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bridlington (BRI) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
02/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62387 |
|
|
12/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|