Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4010 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34660 Week
» 133305 Month
» 335969 Year
» 3362822 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1217 |
m/e |
05/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2389 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
62389 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
D20 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 05/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/09/1954 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
50C |
Selby |
w/e |
16/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/09/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1914 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1943 |
Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1954 |
Darlington Works |
Darlington Works have completed Class '2' B.R. engines up to No. 78039 and withdrawal of old N.E.R. types has speeded up recently. Nos. 69770, 69385, 68258, 68292 (this engine had the extra hanging buffers for shunting the old cauldron wagons long since gone), 68304, 65661/7/86/705/10, and 62358/71/4/80/89. 62371 is of note as she is one of the 1942 rebuilt class''D20' engines, and also, in her early N.E. days as No. 592 she was stationed at Edinburgh, for working the East Coast trains to Newcastle, with Driver John Graham, who was later promoted to Night Running Foreman at Bank Top, Darlington. One thing peculiar to this engine was the absence of brass beading on the splasher above the rear driving wheels, which gave her an odd look. |
SLS/195412 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1907 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1217 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
12/1914 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated LNER Diagram 59A Boiler Fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2389 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Starbeck (SBK) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62389 |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) |
|
|
06/09/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62389 |
|
|
10/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|