Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 1326 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31976 Week
» 130621 Month
» 333285 Year
» 3360138 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
428 |
m/e |
08/1915 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9428 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2437 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62437 |
w/e |
07/10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
D30 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 78 (Round Top firebox) | Reverser | Screw Reverse fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum | Train Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 08/1915 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1958 |
Service Life |
42 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1915 |
HAY |
|
Haymarket |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64A |
|
St Margarets |
4w/e |
02/09/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
03/09/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/06/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1936 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
05/1936 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1915 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 428, name: ADAM WOODCOCK Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9428 |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2437 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62437 |
|
|
02/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62437 |
|
|
11/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|